U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00661
  • Case Name: Stone v. Harvonek
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Certiorari - Supreme Court]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • September 02, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 05, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 05, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.