U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00666
  • Case Name: Detter v. Cross Country Staffing Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 03, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.