U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00667
  • Case Name: Lowe v. Farmers Insurance Company Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 12, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.