U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00664
  • Case Name: Owens et al v. Flowers Foods Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • October 28, 2022: [Remand]
  • October 28, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.