U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00665
  • Case Name: Miller v. Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • December 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.