U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00669
  • Case Name: McKaufman v. Child Support Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • September 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • August 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.