U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00674
  • Case Name: Moore v. Paycom Software Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • November 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.