U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00672
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Settlement Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 06, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 09, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.