U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00671
  • Case Name: Shannon v. Nationwide Recovery Systems
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.