U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00677
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Glaxosmithkline LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 25, 2022: [Conditional Transfer Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Case Stayed]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • August 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 09, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.