U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00682
  • Case Name: First United Bank Insurance Solutions Inc v. Inservices LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.