U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00679
  • Case Name: Garage Door Services of Houston Inc v. Fry et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 07, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 31, 2022: [Remand]
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.