U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00680
  • Case Name: Walters v. Veritiv Operating Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 10, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.