U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00676
  • Case Name: Lester v. Whitten et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 10, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 10, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.