U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00683
  • Case Name: Brewer v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order for Response]
  • January 17, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 17, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 17, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 11, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.