U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00678
  • Case Name: Perez v. Bowen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • November 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • October 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 11, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.