U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00685
  • Case Name: Dunn-Anderson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • January 09, 2023: [General Order 23-1 and Consent Form]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.