U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00686
  • Case Name: Ortiz v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [ERISA Admin Record]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [ERISA Admin Record]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.