U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00690
  • Case Name: Giles et al v. 3M Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • September 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 12, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.