U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00688
  • Case Name: Plater v. Phoenix Financial Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Supplement]
  • August 25, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 22, 2022: [Supplement]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.