U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00693
  • Case Name: Gonzalez v. Farris
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 15, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 15, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.