U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00694
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 15, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 15, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.