U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00698
  • Case Name: Serrano et al v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.