U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00695
  • Case Name: American Builders Insurance Company Risk Retention Group Inc v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 08, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 01, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.