U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00701
  • Case Name: Foster v. LM General Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 26, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 16, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.