U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00702
  • Case Name: Great Lakes Insurance SE v. Fredy Valle et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document/Directing Filing of Redacted Document]
  • October 03, 2022: [Seal Document/Directing Filing of Redacted Document]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 28, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.