U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00705
  • Case Name: Webster et al v. K-MAC Enterprises Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 17, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.