U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00703
  • Case Name: Powers v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 07, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 07, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 06, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 08, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • October 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 17, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.