U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00708
  • Case Name: Moore v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.