U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00707
  • Case Name: Burns v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Receipt]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Vacating Report and Recommendation]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.