U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00710
  • Case Name: Braver v. Clear Sky Financial LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.