U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00709
  • Case Name: Stephen v. Security Finance of Oklahoma LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 03, 2023: [Strike]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Surreply]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 13, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 05, 2022: [Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 29, 2022: [Strike]
  • November 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 31, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 10, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.