U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00711
  • Case Name: Young v. University of Central Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.