U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00715
  • Case Name: Teague v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 01, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 01, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 27, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.