U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00713
  • Case Name: Garrett v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 26, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 19, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.