U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00717
  • Case Name: Hormizi v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 12, 2022: [Receipt]
  • October 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.