U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00716
  • Case Name: Wilson et al v. Lawton City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 29, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.