U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00719
  • Case Name: The United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Titain Construction LLC et al v. Penn Construction Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Joint Status Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 19, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.