U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00722
  • Case Name: Green v State of Oklahoma
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 27, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 09, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • November 28, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 06, 2022: [Supplement]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 22, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 22, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.