U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00725
  • Case Name: Stoddart et al v. Devon Energy Production Company LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 01, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.