U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00730
  • Case Name: Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Social Security Opening Brief]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 22, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 22, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 21, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 02, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.