U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00728
  • Case Name: Dunbar v. Dowling
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • December 14, 2022: [Receipt]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 23, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 23, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.