U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00734
  • Case Name: Hull et al v. Walmart Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • September 13, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 24, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.