U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00732
  • Case Name: Bohannon v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 14, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.