U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00733
  • Case Name: Saville v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 07, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 03, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.