U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00735
  • Case Name: Whitehead v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [General Order 23-1 and Consent Form]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 02, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.