U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00736
  • Case Name: MWI Veterinary Supply Co v. Duffy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Default]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.