U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00737
  • Case Name: Ware v. Mercy Health
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 17, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.