U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00742
  • Case Name: Hill v. DeJoy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 19, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • December 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 16, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.