U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00743
  • Case Name: Hughey v. Aldi Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 29, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.